UNIT DIGIT OF SQUAREOF A NUMBER WORKSHEET

Find the unit digit of the following squares :

Question 1 :

142

Question 2 :

782

Question 3 :

272

Question 4 :

412

Question 5 :

2352

Question 6 :

14362

Question 7 :

3170522

Question 8 :

1002

1. Answer :

142

In 142, the base is '14'.

Since the unit digit of the base 14 is '4', the resulting number of 142 will end in '6'.

So, the unit digit of 142 is '6'. 

Justification :

142 = 14 x 14 = 196

In 196, the unit digit is '6'.

2. Answer :

782

In 782, the base is '78'.

Since the unit digit of the base 78 is '8', the resulting number of 782 will end in '4'.

So, the unit digit of 782 is '4'.

Alternative Method :

782 = 78 x 78

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

8 x 8 = 64

The unit digit of 64 is '4'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 782 is '4'.

3. Answer :

272

In 272, the base is '27'.

Since the unit digit of the base 27 is '7', the resulting number of 272 will end in '9'.

So, the unit digit of 272 is '9'.

Alternative Method :

272 = 27 x 27

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

7 x 7 = 49

The unit digit of 49 is '9'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 272 is '9'.

4. Answer :

412

In 412, the base is '41'.

Since the unit digit of the base 41 is '1', the resulting number of 412 will end in '1'.

So, the unit digit of 412 is '1'.

Alternative Method :

412 = 41 x 41

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

1 x 1 = 1

The unit digit of 1 is '1'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 412 is '1'.

5. Answer :

2352

In 2352, the base is '235'.

Since the unit digit of the base 235 is '5', the resulting number of 2352 will end in '5'.

So, the unit digit of 2352 is '5'.

Alternative Method :

2352 = 235 x 235

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

5 x 5 = 25

The unit digit of 25 is '5'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 252 is '5'.

6. Answer :

14362

In 14362, the base is '1436'.

Since the unit digit of the base 1436 is '6', the resulting number of 14362 will end in '6'.

So, the unit digit of 14362 is '6'.

Alternative Method :

14362 = 1436 x 1436

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

6 x 6 = 36

The unit digit of 36 is '6'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 14362 is '6'.

7. Answer :

3170522

In 3170522, the base is '317052'.

Since the unit digit of the base 317052 is '2', the resulting number of 3170522 will end in '2'.

So, the unit digit of 3170522 is '4'.

Alternative Method :

3170522 = 317052 x 317052

Multiply only the unit digits on the right side.

2 x 2 = 4

The unit digit of 4 is '4'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 3170522 is '4'.

8. Answer :

1002

In 1002, the base is '100'.

Since the unit digit of the base 100 is '0', the resulting number of 1002 will end in '0'.

So, the unit digit of 1002 is '0'.

Alternative Method :

1002 = 100 x 100 = 10000

The unit digit of 10000 is '0'.

Therefore, the unit digit of 1002 is '0'.

Solo Build It!

Kindly mail your feedback to v4formath@gmail.com

We always appreciate your feedback.

©All rights reserved. onlinemath4all.com

Recent Articles

  1. Solving for a Specific Variable Worksheet

    Aug 12, 22 02:41 AM

    Solving for a Specific Variable Worksheet

    Read More

  2. Solving for a Specific Variable

    Aug 12, 22 02:37 AM

    Solving for a Specific Variable - Concept - Solved Examples

    Read More

  3. Nature of the Roots of a Quadratic Equation Worksheet

    Aug 10, 22 10:23 PM

    Nature of the Roots of a Quadratic Equation Worksheet

    Read More