In this section, you will learn the shortcuts which will be useful to do times table easily.
To understand the shortcuts, you have to remember the following multiplication.
Single digit number x Single digit number
Example :
6 x 7 = 42
8 x 9 = 72
4 x 9 = 36
And it is difficult for us to remember answer for
two digit number x single digit number
and
two digit number x two digit number
Here, we have given shortcuts to find answer for the above multiplications which come in times table.
This method is explained for 1 at the ten's place of two digit number (Times Table).
Steps to be followed to understand the above shortcut :
Step 1 :
First take the single digit number and multiply it by 10.
(7 x 10 = 70 in the above example)
Step 2 :
Multiply the single digit and unit digit of the two digit number.
(7 x 2 = 14 in the above example)
Step 3 :
Add step 1 value and step 2 value.
(70 + 14 = 84 in the above example)
Try yourself :
14 x 8 = ?
19 x 8 = ?
7 x 18 = ?
In this way you can try a lot.
This method is explained for 1 at the ten's place of both the two digit numbers (Times Table).
Method 1 :
Method 2 :
Steps to be followed to understand both the methods :
Step 1 :
Add one of the two digit number and the digit in one's place in the other number. Multiply the result by 10.
(17 + 2 = 19 ----> 19 x 10 = 190)
or
(12 + 7 = 19 ----> 19 x 10 = 190)
Step 2 :
Multiply the digits in one's place of both the numbers.
Step 3 :
Add the results of step 1 and 2, you will get answer.
Try yourself :
17 x 18 = ?
18 x 19 = ?
15 x 19 = ?
In this way, you can try a lot.
To use these shortcuts, you must have much practice on these. Otherwise, the shortcuts explained above will not work properly and you may not be able to get correct answer. So, please do much practice on these shortcuts using different numbers.
Note :
The shortcuts explained above will work only for 1 at the ten's place of two digit numbers and not for any number.
Evaluate the following products.
Problem 1 :
8 x 12
Solution :
8 x 10 = 80 ----A
8 x 2 = 16 ----B
Add A and B.
80 + 16 = 96
Therefore,
8 x 12 = 96
Problem 2 :
9 x 16
Solution :
9 x 10 = 90 ----A
9 x 6 = 54 ----B
Add A and B.
90 + 54 = 144
Therefore,
9 x 16 = 144
Problem 3 :
6 x 18
Solution :
6 x 10 = 60 ----A
6 x 8 = 48 ----B
Add A and B.
60 + 48 = 108
Therefore,
6 x 18 = 108
Problem 4 :
17 x 4
Solution :
4 x 10 = 40 ----A
4 x 7 = 28 ----B
Add A and B.
40 + 28 = 68
Therefore,
17 x 4 = 68
Problem 5 :
19 x 7
Solution :
7 x 10 = 70 ----A
7 x 9 = 63 ----B
Add A and B.
70 + 63 = 133
Therefore,
19 x 7 = 133
Problem 6 :
16 x 6
Solution :
6 x 10 = 60 ----A
6 x 6 = 36 ----B
Add A and B.
60 + 36 = 96
Therefore,
16 x 6 = 96
Problem 7 :
14 x 12
Solution :
14 + 2 = 16 ----> 16 x 10 = 160 ----A
4 x 2 = 8 ----B
Add A and B.
160 + 8 = 168
Therefore,
14 x 12 = 168
Problem 8 :
15 x 13
Solution :
15 + 3 = 18 ----> 18 x 10 = 180 ----A
5 x 3 = 15 ----B
Add A and B.
180 + 15 = 195
Therefore,
15 x 13 = 195
Problem 9 :
19 x 16
Solution :
19 + 6 = 25 ----> 25 x 10 = 250 ----A
9 x 6 = 54 ----B
Add A and B.
250 + 54 = 304
Therefore,
19 x 16 = 304
Problem 10 :
12 x 19
Solution :
12 + 9 = 21 ----> 21 x 10 = 210 ----A
2 x 9 = 18 ----B
Add A and B.
210 + 18 = 228
Therefore,
12 x 19 = 228
Problem 11 :
15 x 18
Solution :
15 + 8 = 23 ----> 23 x 10 = 230 ----A
5 x 8 = 40 ----B
Add A and B.
230 + 40 = 270
Therefore,
15 x 18 = 270
Problem 12 :
14 x 17
Solution :
14 + 7 = 21 ----> 21 x 10 = 210 ----A
4 x 7 = 28 ----B
Add A and B.
210 + 28 = 238
Therefore,
14 x 17 = 238
Kindly mail your feedback to v4formath@gmail.com
We always appreciate your feedback.
©All rights reserved. onlinemath4all.com
Oct 03, 23 12:56 AM
Oct 03, 23 12:34 AM
Oct 02, 23 11:40 PM