## Fast Math

**Online Tutoring for SAT Math by Expert Indian Math Tutor**

**(Based on The College Panda's SAT Math : Advanced Guide and Workbook for the New SAT)**

**Tutoring Charges $10 per hour **

**No credit card required**

**Free demo for 30 minutes**

**Mail us : v4formath@gmail.com **

**Skype id : rams_tpt**

**Mobile : +919994718681**

Fast Math is the topic in which it is being discussed about how calculations in math can be done in fast manner. Today, for many students, Math is the difficult topic to learn. It happens in the child hood of the students due to the difficulty they have in learning times table. Usually students do not have difficulty to learn times table from 2 to 10. Students start having difficulty from the times table 11.; They find it difficult to remember the times table from 11. By learning fast math, students can do calculations in times table from 11 without having remembered.

For example,

If a students wants to know the value of 16x17, they can do the calculation as explained in the following steps.

**Step:1**

In 16 and 17, select the first number and it has to be written in terms of sum of two numbers being one number 10. In our question, the first number in 16x17 is 16. So we have to write 16 as (10+6)

**Step:2**

Now we have to multiply 10 from (10+6) by 17. We get 170----(1).

**Step:3**

Now we have to write 17 as (10+7). Then we have to multiply 6 from (10+6) by (10+7). We will get 60+42 = 102 -------(2).

**Step:4**

Now add (1) & (2). we will get 16x17 = 170 + 102 = 272

Finally , we have 16x17 = 272.

Let us look at one more example as above to have better understanding in doing fast calculations.

**Example:**

Find the value of 18x17.

**Solution: **

**Step:1**

In 18 and 17, select the first number and it
has to be written in terms of sum of two numbers being one number 10. In
our question, the first number in 18x17 is 18. So we have to write 18
as (10+8)

**Step:2**

Now we have to multiply 10 from (10+8) by 17. We get 170----(1).

**Step:3**

Now we have to write 17 as (10+7). Then we have to multiply 8 from (10+8) by (10+7). We will get 80+56 = 136 -------(2).

**Step:4**

Now add (1) & (2). we will get 18x17 = 170 + 136 = 306

Finally , we have 18x17 = 306.

Fast Math to Home Page