# ESTIMATING DECIMALS MULTIPLICATION WORKSHEET

## About "Estimating decimals multiplication worksheet"

"Estimating decimals multiplication worksheet"  is the much needed one to the kids who study math in schools. After having studied the concept "Estimating multiplication with decimal", they are in need of this worksheet for practice problems.

Students are able to remember exact answers for the questions  of

"Single digit number x Single digit number"

Example:

6 x 7 = 42                               8 x 9 = 72                             4 x 9 = 36

When they have multiplications of

"Two digit number x Single digit number"

They are able to get exact answer by using the shortcut given below.

But, when students want to do the multiplications of

"Three digit number x One digit number"

"Three digit number" x Two digit number"

"Decimal number x Decimal number"

they have to calculate step by step. Sometimes students would be asked to estimate the above products without step by step calculation.

Even though estimation is just approximation of the exact answer, we can get quickly.

## Rule to be followed in estimating the products

When we are trying to do "estimating multiplication with decimal",we have to follow the rule given below as much as possible.

If one number is increased to round off,   then decrease the other number (if it is needed to round off).

Sometimes we may have to either increase both the numbers or decrease both the numbers to round off.

Examples :

In 48 x 29, we have

48 ----> 50 and 29 ---->30

In 52 x 31, we have

52 ----> 50 and 31 ---->30

## How to estimate  the product of two number ?

Before you do the problems found in "Estimating decimals multiplication worksheet", first you have to understand the concept.To estimate multiplication with decimals,  we have to round the given numbers to the nearest compatible numbers.

Example 1 :

Estimate the product of 28.3 x 3.2

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

28.3  -----> 30

3.2 -----> 3

Now, the above product will become 30x3

Then the estimated product = 3x3 = 9 ===> 90

Example 2 :

Estimate the product of 34.3 x 3.5

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

34.3  -----> 30

3.5 -----> 4

Now, the above product will become 30x4

Then the estimated product = 3x4 = 12 ===> 120

Example 3 :

Estimate the product of 74.8 x 5.7

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

74.8  -----> 70

5.7 -----> 6

Now, the above product will become 70x6

Then the estimated product = 7x6 = 42 ===> 420

Example 4 :

Estimate the product of 328 x 42

Solution :

This is bit different case.

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

328  -----> 300

42 -----> 40

But both the numbers are decreased. (Because 328 is close to 300 and 42 is close to 40)

Now, the estimated product ===> 300 x 40 = 12000

But the exact product is 13776.

Here, there is bit higher difference between the exact product and estimation.

So, we can round the given numbers as given below.

328 -----> 350

42 -----> 40

Now, the product will become 350 x 40

Then, the estimate of the product = 35x4 = 140 ===>14000

Example 5 :

Estimate the product of 428.5 x 57.3

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

428.5  -----> 400

57.3 -----> 60

Now, the above product will become 400 x 60

Then the estimated product = 4x 6 = 24 ===> 24000

Example 6 :

Estimate the product of 5283 x 78

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

5283  -----> 5000

78 -----> 80

Now, the above product will become 5000 x 80

Then the estimated product = 5x8 = 40 ===> 400000

Example 7 :

Estimate the product of 6523.56 x 73.569

Solution :

In the above product, the numbers can be rounded as given below.

6523.56  -----> 7000

73.569 -----> 70

Now, the above product will become 7000 x 70

Then the estimated product = 7x7 = 49 ===> 490000

After having gone through the stuff given above, we hope that the students would have understood "Estimating decimals multiplication worksheet".

Apart from this, if you need any other stuff in math, please use our google custom search here.

You can also visit our following web pages on different stuff in math.

WORD PROBLEMS

Word problems on simple equations

Word problems on linear equations

Algebra word problems

Word problems on trains

Area and perimeter word problems

Word problems on direct variation and inverse variation

Word problems on unit price

Word problems on unit rate

Word problems on comparing rates

Converting customary units word problems

Converting metric units word problems

Word problems on simple interest

Word problems on compound interest

Word problems on types of angles

Complementary and supplementary angles word problems

Double facts word problems

Trigonometry word problems

Percentage word problems

Profit and loss word problems

Markup and markdown word problems

Decimal word problems

Word problems on fractions

Word problems on mixed fractrions

One step equation word problems

Linear inequalities word problems

Ratio and proportion word problems

Time and work word problems

Word problems on sets and venn diagrams

Word problems on ages

Pythagorean theorem word problems

Percent of a number word problems

Word problems on constant speed

Word problems on average speed

Word problems on sum of the angles of a triangle is 180 degree

OTHER TOPICS

Profit and loss shortcuts

Percentage shortcuts

Times table shortcuts

Time, speed and distance shortcuts

Ratio and proportion shortcuts

Domain and range of rational functions

Domain and range of rational functions with holes

Graphing rational functions

Graphing rational functions with holes

Converting repeating decimals in to fractions

Decimal representation of rational numbers

Finding square root using long division

L.C.M method to solve time and work problems

Translating the word problems in to algebraic expressions

Remainder when 2 power 256 is divided by 17

Remainder when 17 power 23 is divided by 16

Sum of all three digit numbers divisible by 6

Sum of all three digit numbers divisible by 7

Sum of all three digit numbers divisible by 8

Sum of all three digit numbers formed using 1, 3, 4

Sum of all three four digit numbers formed with non zero digits

Sum of all three four digit numbers formed using 0, 1, 2, 3

Sum of all three four digit numbers formed using 1, 2, 5, 6